AK HB31 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to law enforcement training in domestic violence and sexual assault; relating to sexual assault investigation protocols; requiring an inventory and reports on untested sexual assault examination kits; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dom Viol/sex Assault:training; Exam Kits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/18
2018-07-02HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 48 SLA 18
2018-06-27House1:00 PM 6/25/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-11HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-05-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-07HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N1 E3
2018-05-07HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2018-05-01HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-01SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 31(STA)
2018-05-01SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-01SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-01SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-05-01SenateSHOWER, COSTELLO, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, GIESSEL, BISHOP, STEDMAN, HUGHES, KELLY
2018-05-01SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, BEGICH, EGAN, OLSON, WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON, MEYER
2018-05-01SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 31(STA)
2018-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-01SenateSTA SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2018
2018-04-17SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, GARDNER
2018-04-14SenateFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2018-04-14SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2018-04-14SenateNR: OLSON
2018-04-14SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-14SenateFIN RPT SCS(STA) 6DP 1NR
2018-03-23SenateFN4: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2018-03-23SenateFN3: ZERO(DPS)
2018-03-23SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-03-23SenateSTA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE
2017-04-10SenateSTA, FIN
2017-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-07HouseVERSION: CSHB 31(FIN)
2017-04-07HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, WESTLAKE, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, FANSLER
2017-04-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-07HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y40
2017-04-07HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2017-04-07HouseCLAMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-04-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-07HousePASSED Y39 A1
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 31(FIN)
2017-04-07HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-07HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-07HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2017
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2017-04-05HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-05HouseNR: WILSON, TILTON
2017-04-05HouseDP: GARA, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-05HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 2NR
2017-02-08HouseFN1: (DPS)
2017-02-08HouseDP: WOOL, LEDOUX, BIRCH, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-02-08HouseSTA RPT 4DP
2017-01-18HouseSTA, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback