AK HB308 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the limitation of liability for the inspection, installation, or adjustment of a child safety seat or in providing education regarding the installation or adjustment of a child safety seat; and relating to child safety devices in motor vehicles.
Title
Child Safety Seat Installation Liability
Sponsors
Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Cathy Munoz [R] | Rep. Neal Foster [D] | Rep. Adam Wool [D] |
Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Sen. Mia Costello [R] | Sen. Lesil McGuire [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/29/16 |
2016-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/1 CHAPTER 31 SLA 16 |
2016-06-17 | House | 1:43 PM 6/15/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-17 | Senate | VERSION: HB 308 AM |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, MCGUIRE |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 308 AM |
2016-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/16 |
2016-04-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-04-17 | Senate | DP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, COSTELLO, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-04-17 | Senate | JUD RPT 4DP |
2016-04-11 | Senate | JUD |
2016-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-10 | House | VERSION: HB 308 AM |
2016-04-10 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, WOOL, JOSEPHSON |
2016-04-10 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2016-04-10 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 308 AM |
2016-04-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-10 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2016-04-10 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2016 |
2016-04-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-04-07 | House | DP: MILLETT, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN, KELLER, CLAMAN, LEDOUX |
2016-04-07 | House | JUD RPT 6DP |
2016-03-29 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2016-03-29 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2016-03-29 | House | DP: HUGHES, TILTON, OLSON |
2016-03-29 | House | L&C RPT 3DP 2NR |
2016-03-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2016-02-12 | House | L&C, JUD |
2016-02-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |