AK HB307 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 9/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on August 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-09 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 9/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring a person who commits certain offenses under the code of military justice to register as a sex offender or child kidnapper; relating to the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act; relating to contracts made by servicemembers; relating to nonjudicial punishment of members of the organized militia; relating to offenses subject to court-martial proceedings and criminal prosecution; relating to the Department of Public Safety; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Military Justice & Militia Civil Relief
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Gabrielle LeDoux [R] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | House | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 9/1/18 |
2018-08-09 | House | 8:30 AM 8/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-11 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 31 |
2018-05-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 A1 |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2018-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2018-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 307(JUD) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2018-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 307(JUD) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(MVA) |
2018-04-18 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, SHOWER, KELLY |
2018-04-18 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR FORTHCOMING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE |
2018-03-01 | Senate | JUD |
2018-03-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-02-28 | House | VERSION: CSHB 307(JUD) |
2018-02-28 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, GARA, JOSEPHSON |
2018-02-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-02-28 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 V1 |
2018-02-28 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 307(JUD) |
2018-02-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/28 CALENDAR |
2018-02-26 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-02-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-23 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-02-23 | House | FN1: ZERO(MVA) |
2018-02-23 | House | NR: EASTMAN |
2018-02-23 | House | DP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, LEDOUX, REINBOLD, CLAMAN |
2018-02-23 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 6DP 1NR |
2018-02-14 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2018-02-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(MVA) |
2018-02-14 | House | AM: RAUSCHER, LEDOUX |
2018-02-14 | House | NR: SADDLER |
2018-02-14 | House | DP: PARISH, TUCK |
2018-02-14 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 2DP 1NR 2AM |
2018-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-01-24 | House | MLV, JUD |
2018-01-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Civil Procedure
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Intergovernmental Relations
Military
Public Records
Public Safety
Science & Technology
Witnesses
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Intergovernmental Relations
Military
Public Records
Public Safety
Science & Technology
Witnesses