AK HB306 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to disbursement options under the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska and the Teachers' Retirement System of Alaska for participants in the defined contribution plan; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pers/ters Distributions
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2018-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 30 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 3:05 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-08 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 306(FIN) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-08 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-08 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(FIN) |
2018-05-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2018 |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-05-04 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-05-04 | Senate | FIN RPT 3DP 1NR |
2018-04-14 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 306(FIN) |
2018-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 A1 |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(FIN) |
2018-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-13 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-04-12 | House | NR: WILSON, KAWASAKI, GRENN, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, TILTON |
2018-04-12 | House | DP: GUTTENBERG, GARA |
2018-04-12 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 2DP 7NR |
2018-02-23 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-02-23 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON |
2018-02-23 | House | DNP: KNOPP |
2018-02-23 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, BIRCH, KITO |
2018-02-23 | House | L&C RPT 4DP 1DNP 1NR |
2018-01-24 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2018-01-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-01-24 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |