AK HB306 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the review and administration of tax credit programs; requiring the Department of Revenue to report indirect expenditures; relating to the duties of state agencies; requiring the legislative finance division to analyze certain indirect expenditures; relating to lapse dates for appropriations for capital projects; relating to lapse dates for capital budget grants; relating to capital expenditures; relating to unexpended balances of capital projects; repealing the capital projects funds; repealing the insurance tax education credit, the income tax education credit, the oil or gas producer education credit, the property tax education credit, the mining business education credit, the fisheries business education credit, the fisheries business tax credit for scholarship contributions, the fisheries business salmon product development tax credit, the fisheries business salmon utilization tax credit, the fisheries business landing tax credit for scholarship contributions, the fisheries resource landing tax credit for the fisheries resource harvested under the community development quota, the fisheries resource landing tax education credit, and the film production tax credit; providing for an effective date by repealing the effective dates in sec. 7, ch. 57, SLA 2003, the effective date in sec. 57, ch. 92, SLA 2010, and the effective dates in secs. 40 - 42, ch. 51, SLA 2012; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eval. Indirect Expenditures; Tax Credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-23 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: SCS CSHB 306(FIN) am S Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 11 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2014-07-11HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/7 CHAPTER 61 SLA 14
2014-07-02House9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-05-21HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2014-05-15HouseFN7: (REV)
2014-05-15HouseFN6: (LEG)
2014-05-15HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266
2014-05-15HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-05-15SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14
2014-04-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2014-04-23HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: MILLETT
2014-04-23HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-23HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 E2 A5
2014-04-23HouseCONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE
2014-04-23HouseHELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2014-04-23HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-23SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 306(FIN) AM S
2014-04-23SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2014-04-23SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-23SenateEGAN, GIESSEL, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE
2014-04-23SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, STEVENS, DYSON, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE, BISHOP,
2014-04-23SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
2014-04-23SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 306(FIN) AM S
2014-04-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-23SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y4 N14 E1 A1
2014-04-23SenateAM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
2014-04-23Senate...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2014-04-23SenateAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y11 N7 E1 A1
2014-04-23SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y15 N3 E1 A1
2014-04-23SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-23SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-22SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/22 - ON 4/23 CALENDAR
2014-04-21SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/21 - ON 4/22 CALENDAR
2014-04-21SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/21/2014
2014-04-20SenateFN7: (REV)
2014-04-20SenateFN6: (LEG)
2014-04-20SenateFN5: INDETERMINATE(CED)
2014-04-20SenateFN4: ZERO(DNR)
2014-04-20SenateFN3: INDETERMINATE(LWF)
2014-04-20SenateFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2014-04-20SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2014-04-20SenateAM: BISHOP, DUNLEAVY, OLSON
2014-04-20SenateNR: HOFFMAN
2014-04-20SenateDP: MEYER, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH
2014-04-20SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 30
2014-04-20SenateFIN RPT SCS 3DP 1NR 3AM NEW TITLE
2014-04-17SenateFIN
2014-04-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-04-17HouseVERSION: CSHB 306(FIN)
2014-04-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2014-04-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
2014-04-17HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: LEDOUX
2014-04-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-17HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N1 A1
2014-04-17HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2014-04-17HouseJOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2014-04-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2014-04-17HousePASSED Y39 N1
2014-04-17HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2014-04-17HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N26 A3
2014-04-17HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N24 A3
2014-04-17HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(FIN)
2014-04-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): OLSON
2014-04-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/17 CALENDAR
2014-04-16HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
2014-03-24HouseFN7: (REV)
2014-03-24HouseFN6: (LEG)
2014-03-24HouseFN5: INDETERMINATE(CED)
2014-03-24HouseFN4: ZERO(DNR)
2014-03-24HouseFN3: ZERO(LWF)
2014-03-24HouseFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2014-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2014-03-24HouseAM: MUNOZ, GARA
2014-03-24HouseNR: HOLMES, COSTELLO
2014-03-24HouseDP: NEUMAN, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
2014-03-24HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 2NR 2AM
2014-03-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN
2014-03-18HouseCOSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD
2014-03-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON
2014-02-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, CHENAULT, LEDOUX, HAWKER, KELLER, T.WILSON
2014-02-17HouseFIN
2014-02-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB306
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0306A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0306B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0306C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0306D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0306Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2548&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2549&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2550&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2551&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2749&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2751&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2752&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2757&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=28&bill=HB306&jrn=2795&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback