AK HB306 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act declaring a state energy policy.
Title
State Energy Policy
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/14/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 82 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:44 PM 5/25/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2 | |
2010-04-18 | TAKE UP CONCUR | |
2010-04-18 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 306(FIN) AM S | |
2010-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y18 N- A2 | |
2010-04-18 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 306(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO TOP OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-04-17 | FN1: ZERO(H.ENE) | |
2010-04-17 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-04-17 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-17 | FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE | |
2010-04-10 | FN1: ZERO(H.ENE) | |
2010-04-10 | NR: FRENCH, WAGONER, STEVENS | |
2010-04-10 | DP: MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-04-10 | RES RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE | |
2010-03-18 | RES, FIN | |
2010-03-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-17 | VERSION: CSHB 306(RES) | |
2010-03-17 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-17 | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 | |
2010-03-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 306(RES) | |
2010-03-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/17 CALENDAR | |
2010-03-15 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-15 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 3/15/2010 | |
2010-03-15 | FN1: ZERO(H.ENE) | |
2010-03-15 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-03-15 | DP: GUTTENBERG, EDGMON, TUCK, KAWASAKI, SEATON, P.WILSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN | |
2010-03-15 | RES RPT CS(RES) 8DP 1NR | |
2010-02-05 | FN1: ZERO(H.ENE) | |
2010-02-05 | DP: RAMRAS, DAHLSTROM, PETERSEN, TUCK, JOHANSEN, EDGMON, MILLETT | |
2010-02-05 | ENE RPT CS(ENE) 7DP | |
2010-01-19 | ENE, RES | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Buildings
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Hydroelectric Projects
Oil & Gas
Planning
Public Works
Resources
Utilities
Energy
Environmental Concerns
Hydroelectric Projects
Oil & Gas
Planning
Public Works
Resources
Utilities