AK HB304 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act modifying the boundary of Chugach State Park; directing the sale of land to the Eagle River Lions Club; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Chugach State Park/eagle River Lions Club
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Merrick [R] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Ken McCarty [R] | Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] |
Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Kevin McCabe [R] | Rep. DeLena Johnson [R] |
Rep. Mike Cronk [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-10-05 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/30 CHAPTER 49 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-10-05 | House | 12:15 P.M. 7/25/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-04-29 | Senate | VERSION: HB 304 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-04-29 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-29 | Senate | PASSED Y15 N- E3 A2 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 304 |
2022-04-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-04-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2022-04-04 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, BISHOP, STEVENS |
2022-04-04 | Senate | RES RPT 3DP 1AM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | RES |
2022-03-23 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-22 | House | VERSION: HB 304 |
2022-03-22 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON, MCCABE, JOHNSON, CRONK |
2022-03-22 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-03-22 | House | PASSED Y37 N2 E1 |
2022-03-22 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 304 |
2022-03-22 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-03-22 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-22 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2022-03-21 | House | NR: PATKOTAK |
2022-03-21 | House | DP: SCHRAGE, GILLHAM, RAUSCHER, HOPKINS, CRONK, FIELDS, MCKAY |
2022-03-21 | House | RES RPT 7DP 1NR |
2022-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2022-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY |
2022-02-04 | House | RES |
2022-02-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |