AK HB302 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Professional Counselors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend: Board Of Professional Counselors
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Wool [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18 |
2018-07-02 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 42 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 10:06 AM 6/11/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: HB 302 |
2018-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-15 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 |
2018-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 302 |
2018-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-04 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2018-04-02 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GARDNER |
2018-04-02 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP |
2018-02-28 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2018-02-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-02-26 | House | VERSION: HB 302 |
2018-02-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-02-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-02-26 | House | PASSED Y37 E2 V1 |
2018-02-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 302 |
2018-02-23 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/26 CALENDAR |
2018-02-23 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-23 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-02-14 | House | NR: KAWASAKI, PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, TILTON |
2018-02-14 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-02-14 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 4NR |
2018-02-12 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-02-12 | House | DP: STUTES, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO |
2018-02-12 | House | L&C RPT 5DP |
2018-01-24 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |