AK HB302 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to rules of professional conduct for the profession of public accounting.
Title
Public Accountants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/15/14 |
2014-06-20 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/17 CHAPTER 26 SLA 14 |
2014-06-12 | House | 11:17 AM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-15 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 302(L&C) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-15 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 302(L&C) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-04-11 | Senate | DP: DUNLEAVY, STEDMAN, MICCICHE |
2014-04-11 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP |
2014-04-02 | Senate | L&C |
2014-04-02 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-02 | House | VERSION: CSHB 302(L&C) |
2014-04-02 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-02 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2014-04-02 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 302(L&C) |
2014-04-02 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-02 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-02 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-02 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2014-03-31 | House | NR: CHENAULT, HERRON, JOHNSON |
2014-03-31 | House | DP: SADDLER, JOSEPHSON, OLSON |
2014-03-31 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 3NR |
2014-02-10 | House | L&C |
2014-02-10 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |