AK HB30 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to notice of workers' compensation death benefits; relating to the payment of workers' compensation benefits in the case of permanent partial impairment; relating to the payment of workers' compensation death benefits payable to a child of an employee when there is no surviving spouse; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Comp: Death; Perm Partial Impair

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-27SenateREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2020-03-27SenateL&C
2020-03-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-26HouseVERSION: CSHB 30(FIN)
2020-03-26HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-03-26HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2020-03-25HousePRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2020-03-25HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 N2 E3
2020-03-25HousePASSED Y25 N12 E3
2020-03-25HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 30(FIN)
2020-03-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, LEDOUX
2020-03-24HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR
2020-03-24HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-24HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-24HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2020-03-24HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2020
2020-03-11HouseFN5: (LWF)
2020-03-11HouseFN4: (LWF)
2020-03-11HouseFN3: (ADM)
2020-03-11HouseNR: TILTON, LEBON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOHNSTON
2020-03-11HouseDNP: CARPENTER
2020-03-11HouseDP: ORTIZ, KNOPP, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
2020-03-11HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 1DNP 5NR
2019-04-10HouseFN2: (LWF)
2019-04-10HouseFN1: (ADM)
2019-04-10HouseNR: REVAK, TALERICO
2019-04-10HouseDP: HANNAN, FIELDS, STUTES, WOOL, LEDOUX
2019-04-10HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 2NR
2019-02-20HouseL&C, FIN
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-02-20HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/11/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback