AK HB30 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-17 - COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-17 - COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the defined contribution retirement plans for teachers and for public employees; providing a defined benefit retirement plan for teachers and public employees; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal Defined Contrib Retirement Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES | |
2009-04-10 | COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN | |
2009-04-08 | COSPONSOR(S): CRAWFORD | |
2009-04-03 | COSPONSOR(S): BUCH, GARDNER | |
2009-02-13 | COSPONSOR(S): EDGMON, GRUENBERG | |
2009-02-09 | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK | |
2009-01-28 | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, HERRON | |
2009-01-22 | COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM | |
2009-01-20 | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE | |
2009-01-20 | L&C, STA, FIN | |
2009-01-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-20 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=26&bill=HB30 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/26/Bills/HB0030A.PDF |