AK HB3 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the definition of 'disaster.'
Title
Definition Of "disaster": Cybersecurity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Waive Uniform Rule 23 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Waive Uniform Rule 23 (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 8 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/13/22 |
2022-06-17 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 6 SLA 22 |
2022-06-06 | House | 12:00 P.M. 6/6/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-03-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2022-03-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y35 N1 E4 |
2022-03-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-03-09 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-03-08 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 3(JUD) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-03-08 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N- E6 A1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 3(JUD) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/8 CAL |
2022-03-04 | Senate | JUD SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/4/2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, HUGHES |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | NR: SHOWER |
2022-02-04 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, MYERS, HUGHES, KIEHL |
2022-02-04 | Senate | JUD RPT SCS(JUD) 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2021-05-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-05-07 | Senate | AM: REINBOLD |
2021-05-07 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, COSTELLO |
2021-05-07 | Senate | NR: SHOWER |
2021-05-07 | Senate | STA RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM |
2021-04-26 | Senate | MOTION TO WAIVE PUBLICATION NOTICE, RULE 23 FAILED Y12 N7 E1 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2021-04-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-19 | House | VERSION: CSHB 3(JUD) |
2021-04-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-04-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCKAY, JOSEPHSON |
2021-04-19 | House | PASSED Y33 N3 E4 |
2021-04-19 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 3(JUD) |
2021-04-19 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-04-19 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y6 N30 E4 |
2021-04-19 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y3 N33 E4 |
2021-04-19 | House | AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED |
2021-04-19 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N28 E4 |
2021-04-19 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N30 E4 |
2021-04-19 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-04-19 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-19 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, RAUSCHER |
2021-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2021-03-20 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-03-20 | House | AM: EASTMAN, KURKA |
2021-03-20 | House | DP: VANCE, DRUMMOND, KREISS-TOMKINS, SNYDER, CLAMAN |
2021-03-20 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 2AM |
2021-03-08 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-03-08 | House | AM: CLAMAN, STORY, EASTMAN, VANCE, KAUFMAN |
2021-03-08 | House | NR: TARR |
2021-03-08 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-03-08 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 1DP 1NR 5AM |
2021-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCABE |
2021-02-18 | House | STA, JUD |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |