AK HB3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/21/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the employment rights of employees in the state who are members of the National Guard of another state, territory, or district of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natl Guard Leave/reemployment Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/21/18
2018-06-27HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/23 CHAPTER 36 SLA 18
2018-06-27House8:46 AM 6/21/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-05-07HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 E3
2018-05-07HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-03HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-02SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 3(STA)
2018-05-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-02SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-02SenateHUGHES, MEYER, EGAN, KELLY
2018-05-02SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, SHOWER, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BISHOP
2018-05-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 3(STA)
2018-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-02SenateSTA SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-02SenateFN4: ZERO(MVA)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
2018-05-02SenateFN3: ZERO(LWF)(UPDATED FROM RULES)
2018-05-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018
2017-03-27SenateFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-03-27SenateFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-03-27SenateDP: EGAN
2017-03-27SenateNR: DUNLEAVY, COGHILL, GIESSEL, WILSON
2017-03-27SenateSTA RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
2017-02-22SenateSTA
2017-02-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-02-20HouseVERSION: CSHB 3(MLV)
2017-02-20HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-02-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, FANSLER, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, KOPP, TARR, TILTON
2017-02-20HousePASSED Y39 E1
2017-02-20HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 3(MLV)
2017-02-20HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-02-20HouseMLV CS ADOPTED UC
2017-02-20HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-20HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2017
2017-02-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-02-17HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-17HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-02-17HouseDP: JOHNSON, WOOL, KNOPP, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-02-17HouseSTA RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
2017-02-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-02-03HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-02-03HouseDP: LEDOUX, SPOHNHOLZ, PARISH, RAUSCHER, SADDLER, REINBOLD, TUCK
2017-02-03HouseMLV RPT CS(MLV) 7DP
2017-01-18HouseMLV, STA
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback