AK HB3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - STA RPT RECD W/SCS AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the employment rights of employees in the state who are members of the National Guard of another state, territory, or district of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natl Guard Leave/reemployment Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-20 - House of Representatives - House: CSHB 3(MLV) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27SenateSTA RPT RECD W/SCS AWAIT TRANSMITTAL NXT
2017-02-22SenateREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2017-02-22SenateSTA
2017-02-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-02-20HouseVERSION: CSHB 3(MLV)
2017-02-20HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-02-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, FANSLER, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, KOPP, TARR, TILTON
2017-02-20HousePASSED Y39 E1
2017-02-20HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 3(MLV)
2017-02-20HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-02-20HouseMLV CS ADOPTED UC
2017-02-20HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-02-20HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/20/2017
2017-02-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-02-17HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-17HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-02-17HouseDP: JOHNSON, WOOL, KNOPP, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-02-17HouseSTA RPT CS(MLV) 6DP
2017-02-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-02-03HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-02-03HouseDP: LEDOUX, SPOHNHOLZ, PARISH, RAUSCHER, SADDLER, REINBOLD, TUCK
2017-02-03HouseMLV RPT CS(MLV) 7DP
2017-01-18HouseMLV, STA
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback