AK HB298 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-14 - COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to school districts; and relating to layoff plans for tenured teachers.
Title
Layoff Of Tenured Teachers
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] | Rep. Lynn Gattis [R] | Rep. Tammie Wilson [R] | Rep. Wes Keller [R] |
Rep. Kurt Olson [R] | Rep. Dan Saddler [R] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. David Talerico [R] |
Rep. Liz Vazquez [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ |
2016-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2016-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON |
2016-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER |
2016-03-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WILSON |
2016-02-05 | House | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2016-02-05 | House | EDC |
2016-02-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=29&bill=HB298 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0298A.PDF |