AK HB297 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to adult adoption; relating to the duties of the Department of Family and Community Services; relating to child protection; and relating to children of active duty military members.
Title
Military Member Child Protect; Adoption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 1 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 3 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-08 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/22 |
2022-07-08 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 33 SLA 22 |
2022-07-07 | House | 11:15 A.M. 7/7/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-20 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26 |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N1 E1 |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM) AM S |
2022-05-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-16 | Senate | HOLLAND |
2022-05-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, MYERS, STEVENS, BISHOP |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- A3 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM) AM S |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, BEGICH, COSTELLO, HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2022-05-13 | Senate | HSS REFERRAL WAIVED |
2022-05-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DHS/DFC) |
2022-05-13 | Senate | DP: SHOWER, KAWASAKI, HOLLAND, COSTELLO |
2022-05-13 | Senate | STA RPT 4DP |
2022-04-06 | Senate | STA, HSS |
2022-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-04 | House | VERSION: CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM) |
2022-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY, TARR, JOSEPHSON |
2022-04-04 | House | PASSED Y33 N3 E4 |
2022-04-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 297(HSS)(TITLE AM) |
2022-04-04 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-04-04 | House | AM NO 6 FAILED Y4 N32 E4 |
2022-04-04 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y1 N35 E4 |
2022-04-04 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y3 N33 E4 |
2022-04-04 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y2 N34 E4 |
2022-04-04 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N33 E4 |
2022-04-04 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-04-04 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-04 | House | HSS CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-31 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/31 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR |
2022-03-31 | House | SESSION CANCELED 3/30 - ON 3/31 CALENDAR |
2022-03-31 | House | SESSION CANCELED 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR |
2022-03-28 | House | ADJOURNED TO 3/29 CALENDAR |
2022-03-24 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/24 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR |
2022-03-24 | House | SESSION CANCELED 3/23 - ON 3/24 CALENDAR |
2022-03-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2022-03-14 | House | NR: KURKA, PRAX |
2022-03-14 | House | DP: MCCARTY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER |
2022-03-14 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 2NR |
2022-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2022-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2022-02-28 | House | DP: CLAMAN, TARR, STORY, NELSON, SHAW, TUCK |
2022-02-28 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) 6DP |
2022-01-31 | House | MLV, HSS |
2022-01-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |