AK HB291 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/27/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/27/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Council on Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault; establishing the Alaska Criminal Justice Data Analysis Commission; relating to the membership, powers, and duties of the Alaska Criminal Justice Data Analysis Commission; relating to the duties of the Judicial Council; and extending the termination date of the Council on Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault.
Title
Dv Council;ak Crim Just Data Analys Comm
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Adopt Finance Senate Committee Substitute (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Return to Second for Specific Amendment (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt State Affairs CS (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Adopt Finance Senate Committee Substitute (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Return to Second for Specific Amendment (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 13 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 17 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt State Affairs CS (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/27/22 |
2022-06-30 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 23 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 28 |
2022-05-18 | House | VERSION: SCS CSHB 291(FIN)(EFD FLD) |
2022-05-18 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y25 N14 E1 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y21 N18 E1 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR RECEIVED AND HELD |
2022-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 291(FIN) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N5 A1 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-05-18 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED Y11 N9 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND Y11 N7 A2 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 291(STA) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CAL |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FN1: (DPS) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2022-05-17 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-17 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 28 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | FIN |
2022-04-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-26 | House | VERSION: CSHB 291(STA) |
2022-04-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2022-04-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-26 | House | PASSED Y31 N5 E3 A1 |
2022-04-26 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 291(STA) |
2022-04-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, TUCK, SPOHNHOLZ, SCHRAGE, JOSEPHSON |
2022-04-25 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/26 CALENDAR |
2022-04-25 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y15 N23 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2022-04-25 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y13 N25 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y17 N21 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y22 N16 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND RULED OUT OF ORDER |
2022-04-25 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N19 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | AM 1 TO AM 1 FAILED Y18 N20 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2022-04-25 | House | STA CS ADOPTED Y32 N6 E2 |
2022-04-25 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-25 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2022-04-20 | House | NR: MERRICK |
2022-04-20 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON |
2022-04-20 | House | FIN RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 6DP 1NR |
2022-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN |
2022-03-16 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2022-03-16 | House | AM: VANCE |
2022-03-16 | House | NR: KAUFMAN |
2022-03-16 | House | DNP: EASTMAN |
2022-03-16 | House | DP: TARR, CLAMAN, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-03-16 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NEW TITLE 4DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM |
2022-02-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2022-01-27 | House | STA, FIN |
2022-01-27 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Attorney General
Boards & Commissions
Constitution
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Drugs
Mental Health
Public Safety
Rights
Safety
Sentencing
Sunset
Victims Rights
Boards & Commissions
Constitution
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Drugs
Mental Health
Public Safety
Rights
Safety
Sentencing
Sunset
Victims Rights