AK HB291 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the issuance of state-guaranteed revenue bonds by the Alaska Housing Finance Corporation to finance mortgages for qualifying veterans; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Guaranteed Revenue Bonds For Veterans
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-03-24 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-03-24 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-03-24 | FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-03-24 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, KELLY, AUSTERMAN, SALMON, N.FOSTER, | |
2010-03-24 | FIN RPT 11DP | |
2010-02-23 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-02-23 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-02-23 | AM: P.WILSON | |
2010-02-23 | DP: SEATON, GRUENBERG, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2010-02-23 | STA RPT 4DP 1AM | |
2010-02-05 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-02-05 | NR: KAWASAKI | |
2010-02-05 | DP: LYNN, T.WILSON, BUCH, GATTO | |
2010-02-05 | MLV RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2010-01-19 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2010-01-19 | FN1: (GOV) | |
2010-01-19 | MLV, STA, FIN | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=26&bill=HB291 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/26/Bills/HB0291A.PDF |