AK HB29 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/17/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to insurance coverage for benefits provided through telehealth; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage For Telehealth

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/17/20
2020-03-18HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 3/16 CHAPTER 3 SLA 20
2020-03-16House11:05 A.M. 3/16/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2020-03-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2020-03-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-11HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N2 E2
2020-03-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2020-03-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2020-03-10SenateVERSION: SCS HB 29(HSS) AM S
2020-03-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2020-03-10SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-10SenatePASSED Y17 N2 E1
2020-03-10SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, REVAK
2020-03-10SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 29(HSS) AM S
2020-03-09SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/10 CALENDAR
2020-03-09 1970
2020-03-09SenateHSS SCS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-09SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-09SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2020
2020-02-21SenateFN2: ZERO(CED)
2020-02-21SenateNR: GIESSEL
2020-02-21SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF
2020-02-21SenateHSS RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2019-05-08SenateHSS
2019-05-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-05-07HouseVERSION: HB 29
2019-05-07HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-05-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY
2019-05-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-07HousePASSED Y30 N7 E3
2019-05-07HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 29
2019-05-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, TARR, JOSEPHSON
2019-05-06HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/7 CALENDAR
2019-05-06 813
2019-05-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-06HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2019
2019-05-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2019-04-30HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-04-30HouseNR: REVAK, TALERICO
2019-04-30HouseDP: HANNAN, STUTES, FIELDS, WOOL, LEDOUX
2019-04-30HouseL&C RPT 5DP 2NR
2019-03-29HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-03-29HouseNR: PRUITT
2019-03-29HouseDP: CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ
2019-03-29HouseHSS RPT 3DP 1NR
2019-02-20HouseHSS, L&C
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-02-20HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/11/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback