AK HB287 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-21 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-21 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring background investigations of village public safety officer applicants by the Department of Public Safety; relating to the village public safety officer program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Village Public Safety Officer Grants
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Kopp [R] | Rep. Bryce Edgmon [I] | Rep. Tiffany Zulkosky [D] | Rep. John Lincoln [D] |
Rep. Neal Foster [D] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-21 | House | FN4: (DPS) |
2020-03-21 | House | FN3: (DPS) |
2020-03-21 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2020-03-21 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DPS) |
2020-03-21 | House | NR: SHAW, VANCE |
2020-03-21 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, KOPP, CLAMAN |
2020-03-21 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 2NR |
2020-03-16 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: SHAW |
2020-03-11 | House | FN4: (DPS) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN3: (DPS) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2020-03-11 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DPS) |
2020-03-11 | House | NR: VANCE |
2020-03-11 | House | DP: KOPP, LINCOLN, ORTIZ, ZULKOSKY |
2020-03-11 | House | TRB RPT CS(TRB) 4DP 1NR |
2020-03-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2020-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2020-03-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN |
2020-02-24 | House | TRB, JUD, FIN |
2020-02-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska Natives
Alcohol
Appropriations
Domestic Violence
Drugs
Employment
Executive Branch
Fees
Government Organization
Grants
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Mental Health
Municipalities
Native Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Privacy
Public Officers
Public Records
Public Safety
Salaries & Allowances
Unorganized Borough
Alcohol
Appropriations
Domestic Violence
Drugs
Employment
Executive Branch
Fees
Government Organization
Grants
Health & Social Services
Law Enforcement
Mental Health
Municipalities
Native Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Privacy
Public Officers
Public Records
Public Safety
Salaries & Allowances
Unorganized Borough