AK HB287 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act making appropriations for public education and transportation of students; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approp: Pupil Transportation; Education

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 as amended (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading Constitutional Budget Reserve Appropriations (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 16 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-07 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2018-05-04HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 5/3 CHAPTER 6 SLA 18
2018-04-30House9:52 AM 4/30/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-18HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-04-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-18HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y31 N9
2018-04-18HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
2018-04-15HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-04-14SenateVERSION: SCS HB 287(FIN)
2018-04-14SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-04-14SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-14SenatePASSED Y15 N4 A1
2018-04-14SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-04-14SenateAM NO 3 AS AMENDED FAILED Y5 N14 A1
2018-04-14SenateAM 1 TO AM 3 ADOPTED UC
2018-04-14SenateAM NO 3 OFFERED
2018-04-14SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N14 A1
2018-04-14SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N11 A1
2018-04-14SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 287(FIN)
2018-04-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
2018-04-13SenateGIESSEL, BISHOP, COSTELLO, MEYER, COGHILL, KELLY
2018-04-13SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, STEVENS, STEDMAN, VON IMHOF
2018-04-13SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S) REMOVED: WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH
2018-04-13SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-13SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-13SenateWILSON MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING
2018-04-13SenateRULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 4/13/2018
2018-04-13SenateNR: OLSON
2018-04-13SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-13SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2018-02-09SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI
2018-02-09SenateFIN
2018-02-09SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-07HouseVERSION: HB 287(BRF SUP MAJ FLD)
2018-02-07HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
2018-02-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 E4
2018-02-07House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-02-07HouseCBRF SECTION(S) (FLD) Y20 N16 E4
2018-02-07HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 N3 E4
2018-02-07HouseRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-02-07HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-02-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-02-07House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-02-07HouseCBRF SECTION(S) (FLD) Y21 N16 E3
2018-02-07HousePASSED Y32 N5 E3
2018-02-07HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-02-07HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y16 N20 E4
2018-02-07HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2018-02-07HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y16 N21 E3
2018-02-07HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y18 N19 E3
2018-02-07HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y16 N21 E3
2018-02-07HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2018-02-07HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 287
2018-02-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/7 CALENDAR
2018-02-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/2018
2018-02-02HouseAM: TILTON, THOMPSON, PRUITT
2018-02-02HouseDP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI, GARA, ORTIZ, FOSTER, SEATON
2018-02-02HouseFIN RPT 7DP 3AM
2018-01-16HouseFIN
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB287
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0287A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0287B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0287C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0287Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2346&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2347&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2348&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2350&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2351&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2352&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2354&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2355&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2704&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2706&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=2707&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB287&jrn=3360&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback