AK HB282 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations for the operating and capital expenses of the state's integrated comprehensive mental health program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Mental Health Budget
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Adopt the Conference Committee Report Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Effective Date (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Finance CS (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Effective Date (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - House - House: Sustain Ruling of the Chair (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Finance CS (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-06-28 | House | PARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS |
2022-06-28 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 12 SLA 22 |
2022-06-15 | House | 2:30 P.M. 6/15/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-19 | House | LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C) RECEIVED |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y34 N6 |
2022-05-18 | House | CC RPT ADOPTED Y35 N5 CCS HB 282 |
2022-05-18 | House | CC REPORT TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | PRECEDENCE SET TO TAKE UP, SUSTAIN RULING OF CHAIR Y38 N2 |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS HB 282 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CC REPORT TAKEN UP |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PRECEDENCE SET TO TAKE UP |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CC REPORT READ |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CC REPORT: CCS HB 282 RECEIVED 5/18/22 12:32 A.M. |
2022-05-18 | House | FISCAL NOTE PACKET |
2022-05-18 | House | CC REPORT: CCS HB 282 RECEIVED 5/18/22 12:32 A.M. |
2022-05-18 | House | CC REPORT READ AND HELD |
2022-05-16 | House | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2022-05-15 | Senate | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2022-05-15 | Senate | STEDMAN (CHAIR), BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI |
2022-05-15 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N14 E2 A4 |
2022-05-15 | House | MERRICK (CHAIR), ORTIZ, LEBON |
2022-05-15 | House | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2022-05-15 | House | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N36 E1 A3 |
2022-05-15 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-11 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 282(FIN) AM S |
2022-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2022-05-10 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-10 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2022-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 282(FIN) |
2022-05-09 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 5/9 - ON 5/10 CALENDAR |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/9 CAL |
2022-05-05 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-05 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-05 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2022 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | NR: WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2022-05-05 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, STEDMAN, HOFFMAN |
2022-05-05 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2022-04-11 | Senate | FIN |
2022-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 282(FIN) |
2022-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-09 | House | PASSED Y27 N12 E1 |
2022-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 282(FIN) |
2022-04-07 | House | SUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y30 N2 E3 A5 |
2022-04-07 | House | SPREAD ALL AMS NOT OFFERED IN JOURNAL RULED OUT OF ORDER |
2022-04-07 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR |
2022-04-07 | House | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2022-04-07 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2022-04-06 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/7 CALENDAR |
2022-04-05 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/6 CALENDAR |
2022-04-04 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 4/5 CALENDAR |
2022-04-04 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED Y23 N12 E4 A1 |
2022-04-04 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-04 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | NR: ORTIZ, LEBON, CARPENTER, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN |
2022-04-04 | House | DP: EDGMON, FOSTER, MERRICK |
2022-04-04 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 7NR |
2022-01-18 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2022-01-18 | House | OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003 |
2022-01-18 | House | FIN |
2022-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget
Capital Projects
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Disabilities
Disaster
Education
Employment
Families
Grants
Health & Social Services
Housing
Labor
Mental Health
Minors
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Defender
Public Safety
Residential Care
Revenue
Salaries & Allowances
Senior Citizens
Transportation
Universities
Budget
Capital Projects
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Disabilities
Disaster
Education
Employment
Families
Grants
Health & Social Services
Housing
Labor
Mental Health
Minors
Pioneers' Homes
Public Assistance
Public Defender
Public Safety
Residential Care
Revenue
Salaries & Allowances
Senior Citizens
Transportation
Universities