AK HB280 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/13/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a gas storage facility; relating to the Regulatory Commission of Alaska; relating to the participation by the attorney general in a matter involving the approval of a rate or a gas supply contract; relating to an income tax credit for a gas storage facility; relating to oil and gas production tax credits; relating to the powers and duties of the Alaska Oil and Gas Conservation Commission; relating to production tax credits for certain losses and expenditures, including exploration expenditures; relating to the powers and duties of the director of the division of lands and to lease fees for a gas storage facility on state land; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Natural Gas: Storage/ Tax Credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/13/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/12 CHAPTER 16 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 3:54 PM 4/28/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 | |
2010-04-18 | TAKE UP CONCUR | |
2010-04-18 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 280(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, ELLIS, FRENCH | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 280(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | FN6: INDETERMINATE(DNR) | |
2010-04-18 | FN5: ZERO(H.FIN/REV) | |
2010-04-18 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-18 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-18 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON | |
2010-04-18 | DP: HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-18 | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-04-10 | FN5: ZERO(H.FIN/REV) | |
2010-04-10 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(DNR) | |
2010-04-10 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-10 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-10 | NR: STEVENS, FRENCH | |
2010-04-10 | DP: MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, WAGONER | |
2010-04-10 | RES RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE | |
2010-04-08 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, WAGONER | |
2010-03-25 | RES, FIN | |
2010-03-25 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-24 | VERSION: CSHB 280(FIN) AM | |
2010-03-24 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-03-24 | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, STOLTZE | |
2010-03-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-24 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2010-03-24 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2010-03-24 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-24 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-24 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N23 E2 A1 | |
2010-03-24 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-24 | FN5: ZERO(H.FIN/REV) | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 280(FIN) | |
2010-03-23 | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN | |
2010-03-23 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/24 CALENDAR | |
2010-03-23 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-23 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-23 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | FN(S) FORTHCOMING | |
2010-03-22 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(DNR) | |
2010-03-22 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-22 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-03-22 | AM: GARA | |
2010-03-22 | HAWKER | |
2010-03-22 | DP: AUSTERMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, KELLY, N.FOSTER, DOOGAN, THOMAS, JOULE, STOLTZE | |
2010-03-22 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP 1AM | |
2010-03-17 | FN4: (REV) | |
2010-03-17 | FN3: INDETERMINATE(DNR) | |
2010-03-17 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-17 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-03-17 | DP: EDGMON, OLSON, P.WILSON, SEATON, JOHNSON | |
2010-03-17 | RES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP | |
2010-02-17 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-02-17 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-02-17 | AM: BUCH | |
2010-02-17 | NR: HOLMES, T.WILSON | |
2010-02-17 | DP: LYNN, NEUMAN, CHENAULT, OLSON | |
2010-02-17 | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 4DP 2NR 1AM | |
2010-02-10 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2010-01-19 | L&C, RES, FIN | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/10 |
Subjects
Attorney General
Leases
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Land
Public Utilities
Regulations
Resources
Taxation
Utilities
Leases
Oil & Gas
Pipelines
Public Land
Public Utilities
Regulations
Resources
Taxation
Utilities