AK HB28 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the registration of commercial vessels; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registration Of Boats: Exemption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-05-15HousePASSED Y33 N4 E3
2021-05-15HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 FAILED Y16 N21 E3
2021-05-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 28(FIN)
2021-05-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
2021-05-14HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021
2021-05-03HouseFN3: (ADM)
2021-05-03HouseFN2: (DFG)
2021-05-03HouseNR: LEBON, THOMPSON
2021-05-03HouseDNP: CARPENTER, JOHNSON
2021-05-03HouseDP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
2021-05-03HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 2DNP 2NR
2021-03-31HouseFN2: (DFG)
2021-03-31HouseFN1: (ADM)
2021-03-31HouseNR: MCCABE
2021-03-31HouseDP: STORY, STUTES, KREISS-TOMKINS, ORTIZ, TARR
2021-03-31HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) 5DP 1NR
2021-03-12HousePRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: FISHERIES REPLACED STUTES
2021-02-18HouseFSH, FIN
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback