AK HB28 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Passed on June 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to temporary courtesy licenses for certain nonresident professionals and to a temporary exemption from fees and other licensing requirements for active duty members of the armed forces; authorizing temporary licenses for pawnbrokers not currently licensed by a municipality; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Occ. Licenses: Temporary/fees/pawnbrokers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2011-06-27 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/27 CHAPTER 25 SLA 11 | |
2011-06-24 | 10:25 AM 6/10/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-04-13 | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, COSTELLO, FAIRCLOUGH, PRUITT | |
2011-04-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-13 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 10 | |
2011-04-13 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2 | |
2011-04-11 | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER | |
2011-04-11 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2011-04-11 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 28(L&C) | |
2011-04-11 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2011-04-11 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-11 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2011-04-11 | EGAN, DAVIS, MCGUIRE, THOMAS, WAGONER | |
2011-04-11 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, GIESSEL, MEYER, ELLIS, MENARD, PASKVAN, | |
2011-04-11 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 28(L&C) | |
2011-04-11 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-11 | FN2: ZERO(CED) | |
2011-04-11 | L&C SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-11 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2011 | |
2011-04-04 | BILL REPRINTED 4/4/11 | |
2011-03-30 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2011-03-30 | DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD | |
2011-03-30 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 10 | |
2011-03-30 | L&C RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE | |
2011-03-23 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2011-03-23 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL | |
2011-03-23 | STA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2011-02-24 | STA, L&C | |
2011-02-24 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-02-23 | VERSION: CSHB 28(FIN) | |
2011-02-23 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-02-23 | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, KERTTULA, CHENAULT, LYNN, PETERSEN, MILLETT, JOHNSON | |
2011-02-23 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2011-02-23 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 28(FIN) | |
2011-02-23 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-02-23 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-02-23 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-02-23 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2011 | |
2011-02-18 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2011-02-18 | DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-02-18 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, | |
2011-02-18 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP | |
2011-02-09 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2011-02-09 | DP: THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, HOLMES, MILLER, SEATON, OLSON | |
2011-02-09 | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 7DP | |
2011-01-18 | L&C, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |
Subjects
Animals
Boards & Commissions
Construction
Contractors
Death
Dentists
Employment
Estates
Guides
Land
Licensing
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Military
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Residency
Sales
Vessels
Boards & Commissions
Construction
Contractors
Death
Dentists
Employment
Estates
Guides
Land
Licensing
Loans
Medical Care
Mental Health
Military
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians
Psychologists
Residency
Sales
Vessels