AK HB279 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act extending the termination date of the Real Estate Commission; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend: Real Estate Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
2018-07-02HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 40 SLA 18
2018-06-27House10:06 AM 6/11/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-27SenateVERSION: HB 279
2018-04-27SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-27SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-27SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-04-27SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 279
2018-04-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-27SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-27SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2018
2018-04-09SenateFN3: (CED)
2018-04-09SenateNR: MICCICHE
2018-04-09SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS
2018-04-09SenateFIN RPT 5DP 1NR
2018-04-02SenateFN2: (CED)
2018-04-02SenateNR: MICCICHE
2018-04-02SenateDP: COSTELLO, GARDNER
2018-04-02SenateL&C RPT 2DP 1NR
2018-03-07SenateL&C, FIN
2018-03-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-05HouseVERSION: HB 279
2018-03-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2018-03-05HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-03-05HousePASSED Y36 E3 V1
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 279
2018-03-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018
2018-02-16HouseFN2: (CED)
2018-02-16HouseNR: PRUITT, GRENN, TILTON, GUTTENBERG
2018-02-16HouseDP: WILSON, GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-02-16HouseFIN RPT 7DP 4NR
2018-02-12HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-02-12HouseDP: STUTES, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, KITO
2018-02-12HouseL&C RPT 5DP
2018-01-16HouseL&C, FIN
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback