AK HB278 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend:cert. Real Estate Appraisers Board

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-02SenateVERSION: HB 278
2018-05-02SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-02SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-02SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 278
2018-05-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018
2018-04-09SenateFN2: (CED)
2018-04-09SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-09SenateFIN RPT 6DP
2018-04-02SenateFN1: (CED)
2018-04-02SenateDP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GARDNER
2018-04-02SenateL&C RPT 3DP
2018-03-07SenateL&C, FIN
2018-03-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-05HouseVERSION: HB 278
2018-03-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK
2018-03-05HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-03-05HousePASSED Y36 E3 V1
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 278
2018-03-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018
2018-02-14HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-02-14HouseNR: PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, TILTON
2018-02-14HouseDP: WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-02-14HouseFIN RPT 6DP 3NR
2018-02-12HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-02-12HouseDP: EDGMON, STUTES, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON, KITO
2018-02-12HouseL&C RPT 5DP
2018-01-16HouseL&C, FIN
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback