AK HB278 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend:cert. Real Estate Appraisers Board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/18 |
2018-07-02 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 39 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 10:06 AM 6/11/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-02 | Senate | VERSION: HB 278 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-02 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-02 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 278 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-02 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-02 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2018 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-09 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2018-04-02 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, GARDNER |
2018-04-02 | Senate | L&C RPT 3DP |
2018-03-07 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2018-03-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-03-05 | House | VERSION: HB 278 |
2018-03-05 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2018-03-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-03-05 | House | PASSED Y36 E3 V1 |
2018-03-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 278 |
2018-03-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-03-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-03-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-02-14 | House | NR: PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, TILTON |
2018-02-14 | House | DP: WILSON, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-02-14 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 3NR |
2018-02-12 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2018-02-12 | House | DP: EDGMON, STUTES, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2018-02-12 | House | L&C RPT 5DP |
2018-01-16 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |