AK HB277 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the regulation of broadband Internet; and making certain actions by broadband Internet service providers unlawful acts or practices under the Alaska Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Broadband Internet: Neutrality/regulation
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] | Rep. Justin Parish [D] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Zach Fansler [D] |
Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-07 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(CED) |
2018-03-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-03-07 | House | NR: STUTES, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, KITO |
2018-03-07 | House | DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, KNOPP |
2018-03-07 | House | L&C RPT 3DNP 4NR |
2018-02-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-01-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-01-16 | House | L&C, FIN |
2018-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-01-12 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/12/18 |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Corporations
Disclosure
Internet
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Trade Practices
Utilities
Consumer Affairs
Contracts
Corporations
Disclosure
Internet
Regulations
Regulatory Actions
Trade Practices
Utilities
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB277 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0277A.PDF |