AK HB277 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the Department of Health and Social Services to adopt standards for the approval of and to approve certain training programs relating to the possession of epinephrine and the administration of epinephrine in emergency situations; and authorizing certain individuals to obtain a prescription for epinephrine, purchase epinephrine, and administer epinephrine in emergency situations.
Title
Emergency Use Of Epinephrine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/7/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 52 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:19 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: CSHB 277(HSS) | |
2010-04-14 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 277(HSS) | |
2010-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | FN2: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-04-13 | FN1: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-04-13 | DP: DAVIS, PASKVAN, DYSON | |
2010-04-13 | HSS RPT 3DP | |
2010-04-06 | HSS | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-05 | VERSION: CSHB 277(HSS) | |
2010-04-05 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-04-05 | PASSED Y37 E3 | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 277(HSS) | |
2010-04-05 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-05 | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-05 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2010 | |
2010-03-31 | FN2: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-03-31 | FN1: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-03-31 | NR: T.WILSON, KELLER, HERRON | |
2010-03-31 | DP: HOLMES, SEATON, LYNN, CISSNA | |
2010-03-31 | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 4DP 3NR | |
2010-01-19 | HSS | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/10 |