AK HB276 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/31/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/31/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the description of parcels within the Fort Rousseau Causeway State Historical Park; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Fort Rousseau Causeway Hist Park
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-31 | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/30 CHAPTER 3 SLA 10 | |
2010-03-15 | 3:51 PM 3/12/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-03-10 | VERSION: CSHB 276(CRA) | |
2010-03-10 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-03-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-10 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-03-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 276(CRA) | |
2010-03-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-02-24 | NR: OLSON, FRENCH | |
2010-02-24 | DP: MENARD, THOMAS | |
2010-02-24 | CRA RPT 2DP 2NR | |
2010-02-12 | CRA | |
2010-02-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-02-10 | VERSION: CSHB 276(CRA) | |
2010-02-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-02-10 | COSPONSOR(S): CISSNA | |
2010-02-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-02-10 | PASSED Y38 E2 | |
2010-02-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 276(CRA) | |
2010-02-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-02-10 | CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-02-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-02-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2010-02-03 | NR: GARDNER, HERRON | |
2010-02-03 | DP: KELLER, MUNOZ | |
2010-02-03 | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 2DP 2NR | |
2010-01-19 | CRA | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/15/10 |