AK HB275 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/16/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Massage Therapists; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend: Board Of Massage Therapists

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/16/18
2018-06-27HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 5/15 CHAPTER 9 SLA 18
2018-06-27House12:05 PM 5/14/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-18HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 22
2018-04-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-18HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
2018-04-18HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-04-18HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-04-17SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 275(FIN)
2018-04-17SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-04-17SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-17SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-17SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 275(FIN)
2018-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-17SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-16SenateNOT TAKEN UP 4/16 - ON 4/17 CALENDAR
2018-04-16SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/18
2018-04-15SenateFN3: (CED)
2018-04-15SenateNR: OLSON
2018-04-15SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-15SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 22
2018-04-15SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2018-04-02SenateFN2: (CED)
2018-04-02SenateAM: MICCICHE
2018-04-02SenateDP: COSTELLO, GARDNER
2018-04-02SenateL&C RPT 2DP 1AM
2018-03-07SenateL&C, FIN
2018-03-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-05HouseVERSION: CSHB 275(FIN)
2018-03-05HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR, MILLETT
2018-03-05HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-03-05HousePASSED Y36 E3 V1
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 275(FIN)
2018-03-05HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-05HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-05HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-05HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2018
2018-03-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-02-14HouseFN2: (CED)
2018-02-14HouseNR: PRUITT, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, TILTON
2018-02-14HouseDP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-02-14HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 4NR
2018-01-31HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-01-31HouseNR: JOSEPHSON, BIRCH
2018-01-31HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, WOOL, KNOPP, KITO
2018-01-31HouseL&C RPT 5DP 2NR
2018-01-16HouseL&C, FIN
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-12HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/12/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback