AK HB275 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing Katie John Day; and establishing Indigenous Peoples Day.
Title
Indigenous Peoples Day;katie John Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2016-04-04 | Senate | STA |
2016-04-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-01 | House | VERSION: CSHB 275(STA) AM |
2016-04-01 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2016-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TARR, LEDOUX, SEATON, GARA |
2016-04-01 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2016-04-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 275(STA) AM |
2016-04-01 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-01 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2016-04-01 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-01 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2016-04-01 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-01 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, TUCK |
2016-03-23 | House | FN2: ZERO(LEG) |
2016-03-23 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2016-03-23 | House | DP: SPOHNHOLZ, STUTES, KELLER, TALERICO, VAZQUEZ, KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2016-03-23 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 7DP |
2016-01-25 | House | STA |
2016-01-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |