AK HB274 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/20/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-23 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/20/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing August 7 as Purple Heart Day.
Title
Establishing Purple Heart Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/20/10 | |
2010-03-23 | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/22 CHAPTER 2 SLA 10 | |
2010-03-10 | 2:25 PM 3/9/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-03-01 | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN, JOULE | |
2010-03-01 | VERSION: HB 274 | |
2010-03-01 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-03-01 | PASSED Y16 N- E4 | |
2010-03-01 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 274 | |
2010-03-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-01 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-01 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2010 | |
2010-02-24 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, BUNDE, WAGONER | |
2010-02-24 | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) | |
2010-02-24 | DP: MENARD, FRENCH, MEYER, PASKVAN | |
2010-02-24 | STA RPT 4DP | |
2010-02-10 | COGHILL, THOMAS, STEVENS, PASKVAN | |
2010-02-10 | MENARD, EGAN, MEYER, MCGUIRE, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, | |
2010-02-10 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, DAVIS, FRENCH, KOOKESH, ELLIS, | |
2010-02-10 | STA | |
2010-02-10 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-02-08 | VERSION: HB 274 | |
2010-02-08 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2010-02-08 | COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, STOLTZE | |
2010-02-08 | PASSED Y36 E4 | |
2010-02-08 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 274 | |
2010-02-08 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-02-08 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-02-08 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/8/2010 | |
2010-02-05 | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, SALMON, KELLY, CRAWFORD, JOHANSEN | |
2010-02-05 | STA REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2010-02-03 | HARRIS, N.FOSTER, HOLMES | |
2010-02-03 | COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON, SEATON, CISSNA, KAWASAKI, EDGMON, KERTTULA, GARA, | |
2010-02-03 | FN1: ZERO(H.MLV) | |
2010-02-03 | DP: KAWASAKI, LYNN, T.WILSON, BUCH, RAMRAS, GATTO | |
2010-02-03 | MLV RPT 6DP | |
2010-01-21 | COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT | |
2010-01-19 | MLV, STA | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/10 |