AK HB273 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-07 - COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Council on Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extending Council On Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsey Holmes [D] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Max Gruenberg [D] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] |
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] |
Sen. Mia Costello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2014-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN |
2014-02-19 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-02-19 | House | FN1: (DPS) |
2014-02-19 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-02-19 | House | STA RPT 5DP |
2014-02-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2014-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON |
2014-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2014-01-24 | House | STA, FIN |
2014-01-24 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB273 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0273A.PDF |