AK HB27 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming the irene Webber Bridge.
Title
Naming Irene Webber Bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/11/21 |
2021-08-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 21 SLA 21 |
2021-08-16 | House | 4:46 P.M. 7/2/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-28 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-06-28 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69 |
2021-06-28 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: HB 27 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 27 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-05-05 | Senate | NR: WILSON |
2021-05-05 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2021-05-05 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 1NR |
2021-04-21 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DP: MYERS, KIEHL, BISHOP, MICCICHE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | TRA RPT 4DP |
2021-04-12 | Senate | TRA, FIN |
2021-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-09 | House | VERSION: HB 27 |
2021-04-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-04-09 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2021-04-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 27 |
2021-04-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-04-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-03-31 | House | RASMUSSEN, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2021-03-31 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, |
2021-03-31 | House | FIN RPT 11DP |
2021-03-12 | House | FN1: (DOT) |
2021-03-12 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, CRONK, HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCABE, HOPKINS |
2021-03-12 | House | TRA RPT 6DP |
2021-02-19 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER TRA |
2021-02-18 | House | TRA |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-02-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |