AK HB269 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - COSPONSOR REMOVED: KNOPP
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to distillery licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distillery Licensees; Service On Premises

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: KNOPP
2018-02-09HouseREFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
2018-02-09HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-02-09HouseNR: SADDLER, TALERICO
2018-02-09HouseDP: KREISS-TOMKINS, LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, PARISH
2018-02-09HouseCRA RPT 4DP 2NR
2018-01-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2018-01-16HouseCRA, L&C
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-12HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/12/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback