AK HB268 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the prescription of opioids; relating to the Department of Health and Social Services; relating to the practice of dentistry; relating to the practice of medicine; relating to the practice of podiatry; relating to the practice of osteopathy; relating to the practice of nursing; and relating to the practice of optometry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Prescription Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2018-04-09HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-04-09HouseAM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, THOMPSON, PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, TILTON
2018-04-09HouseDP: GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-09HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 7AM
2018-03-07HouseFN1: (CED)
2018-03-07HouseNR: JOHNSTON, CLAMAN, EDGMON, SADDLER, KITO
2018-03-07HouseDNP: EASTMAN
2018-03-07HouseDP: TARR
2018-03-07HouseHSS RPT CS(HSS) 1DP 1DNP 5NR
2018-01-22HouseHSS, FIN
2018-01-22HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-22HouseSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2018-01-16HouseHSS, L&C
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-12HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/12/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback