AK HB265 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on July 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-14 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to telehealth; relating to the practice of medicine and the practice of nursing; relating to medical assistance coverage for services provided by telehealth; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Health Care Services By Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-14 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-07-14 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 38 SLA 22 |
2022-06-27 | House | 11:10 A.M. 6/27/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-15 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N1 A2 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 265(FIN) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 265(FIN) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-15 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, KIEHL |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FN9: (CED) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FN8: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FN7: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2022-05-15 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, WILSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-15 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2022-05-03 | Senate | FN8: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | FN7: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | FN6: (CED) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2022-05-03 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2022-04-29 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2022-04-29 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-27 | House | VERSION: CSHB 265(FIN) |
2022-04-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK, NELSON, LEBON, MCCABE |
2022-04-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-27 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 E1 |
2022-04-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 265(FIN) |
2022-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS, STORY, HANNAN, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON |
2022-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CAL |
2022-04-26 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N32 E2 A1 |
2022-04-26 | House | CALL FOR THE QUESTION UC |
2022-04-26 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED |
2022-04-26 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N33 E2 A1 |
2022-04-26 | House | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2022-04-26 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-26 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2022-04-26 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | House | FN8: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-04-20 | House | FN7: (DHS/DOH) |
2022-04-20 | House | FN6: (CED) |
2022-04-20 | House | FN5: ZERO(DHS/DOH) |
2022-04-20 | House | NR: CARPENTER, JOHNSON |
2022-04-20 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, WOOL, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2022-04-20 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 6DP 2NR |
2022-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MERRICK |
2022-03-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, TARR |
2022-03-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN, SCHRAGE |
2022-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY |
2022-03-14 | House | FN4: (DHS) |
2022-03-14 | House | FN3: (DHS) |
2022-03-14 | House | FN2: (CED) |
2022-03-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2022-03-14 | House | AM: KURKA |
2022-03-14 | House | NR: PRAX |
2022-03-14 | House | DP: MCCARTY, SPOHNHOLZ, FIELDS, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER |
2022-03-14 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NEW TITLE 5DP 1NR 1AM |
2022-03-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GILLHAM |
2022-01-18 | House | HSS, FIN |
2022-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/14/22 |
Subjects
Communications
Consumer Affairs
Dentists
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Science & Technology
Consumer Affairs
Dentists
Health & Social Services
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Pharmacists
Physicians
Science & Technology