AK HB264 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a fee for disposable shopping bags; relating to the sale of reusable shopping bags; relating to the recycling of disposable shopping bags; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Shopping Bag Fees & Recycling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-04-09 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2018-04-09 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, STUTES, KNOPP |
2018-04-09 | House | DP: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, KITO |
2018-04-09 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 3DP 3NR |
2018-02-23 | House | FN1: (REV) |
2018-02-23 | House | AM: LINCOLN, KREISS-TOMKINS, PARISH |
2018-02-23 | House | DNP: SADDLER, TALERICO |
2018-02-23 | House | DP: DRUMMOND |
2018-02-23 | House | CRA RPT CS(CRA) 1DP 2DNP 3AM |
2018-01-16 | House | CRA, L&C |
2018-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-01-08 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18 |
Subjects
Consumer Affairs
Fees
Funds
Grants
Hazardous Waste
Highways
Historic Preservation
Land
Legislature
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Recreation
Public Land
Resources
Sales
Fees
Funds
Grants
Hazardous Waste
Highways
Historic Preservation
Land
Legislature
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Recreation
Public Land
Resources
Sales