AK HB263 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the Alaska senior benefits payment program.
Title
Extend Senior Benefits Payment Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-21 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 A1 |
2014-04-21 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-20 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-20 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 263(FIN) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-20 | Senate | MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH, STEDMAN, MEYER |
2014-04-20 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS, OLSON, STEVENS, FRENCH, KELLY, DYSON, |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 263(FIN) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-19 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 4/19 - ON 4/20 CALENDAR |
2014-04-19 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/19/14 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2014-04-19 | Senate | MEMO REGARDING FISCAL NOTE CORRECTION ON FIN CMTE REPORT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | NR: DUNLEAVY |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: KELLY, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN, OLSON |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2014-03-24 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, MEYER |
2014-03-24 | Senate | HSS RPT 3DP |
2014-03-21 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2014-02-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-02-26 | House | VERSION: CSHB 263(HSS) |
2014-02-26 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-02-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, TARR, KITO III, KAWASAKI, LEDOUX |
2014-02-26 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E2 |
2014-02-26 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2014-02-24 | House | KREISS-TOMKINS, LYNN |
2014-02-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, MILLETT, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON, T.WILSON, GRUENBERG, |
2014-02-24 | House | TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-02-24 | House | PASSED Y34 E4 A1 V1 |
2014-02-24 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 263(HSS) |
2014-02-24 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-24 | House | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-24 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-24 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/24/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, GUTTENBERG |
2014-02-19 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2014-02-19 | House | STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-02-19 | House | DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, GARA, COSTELLO, |
2014-02-19 | House | FIN RPT CS(HSS) NT 10DP |
2014-02-05 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2014-02-05 | House | DP: SEATON, REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS |
2014-02-05 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 7DP |
2014-01-21 | House | HSS, FIN |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |