AK HB260 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to possession of certain licenses, tags, and permits issued by the Department of Fish and Game; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fish & Game Licenses; Electronic Form

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/14/18
2018-07-16HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 54 SLA 18
2018-07-09House1:37 PM 7/9/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-11SenateVERSION: CSHB 260(FIN) AM
2018-05-11SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-11SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-11SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, MEYER, EGAN, GARDNER, HUGHES, COSTELLO
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 260(FIN) AM
2018-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-11SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018
2018-05-10SenateFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2018-05-10SenateAM: OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-05-10SenateNR: HOFFMAN, BISHOP
2018-05-10SenateDP: MACKINNON, VON IMHOF, STEVENS
2018-05-10SenateFIN RPT 3DP 2NR 2AM
2018-05-07SenateFIN
2018-05-07SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-05-04HouseVERSION: CSHB 260(FIN) AM
2018-05-04HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-05-04HouseJOSEPHSON, TUCK
2018-05-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, BIRCH, MILLETT, STUTES, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ,
2018-05-04HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-04HousePASSED Y37 E2 A1
2018-05-04HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 260(FIN) AM
2018-05-04HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-04HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y28 N9 E2 A1
2018-05-04HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-04HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-04HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/4/2018
2018-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-04-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, THOMPSON, PRUITT, WILSON
2018-04-17HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2018-04-17HouseDP: GARA, WILSON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-17HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP
2018-04-06HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2018-04-06HouseNR: PARISH, JOSEPHSON
2018-04-06HouseDP: BIRCH, TALERICO, LINCOLN, DRUMMOND, TARR
2018-04-06HouseRES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 2NR
2018-03-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
2018-02-28HouseFN1: ZERO(DFG)
2018-02-28HouseDP: EDGMON, EASTMAN, NEUMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, CHENAULT, STUTES
2018-02-28HouseFSH RPT 6DP
2018-01-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2018-01-16HouseFSH, RES, FIN
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-08HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback