AK HB259 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to containing or confining loads being transported on highways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confining Vehicle Loads

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-04-25SenateFN2: ZERO(DOT)
2018-04-25SenateNR: KELLY, SHOWER
2018-04-25SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO
2018-04-25SenateJUD RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2018-04-18SenateFN2: ZERO(DOT)
2018-04-18SenateDP: EGAN
2018-04-18SenateNR: STEDMAN, WILSON, BISHOP
2018-04-18SenateTRA RPT SCS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
2018-03-16SenateTRA, JUD
2018-03-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-15HouseVERSION: CSHB 259(JUD) AM
2018-03-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2018-03-15HousePASSED Y33 N4 E3
2018-03-15HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-03-15HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N33 E3
2018-03-15HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y34 N3 E3
2018-03-15HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2018-03-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 259(JUD)
2018-03-14HouseHELD TO 3/15 CALENDAR
2018-03-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2018-03-12HouseHELD TO 3/14 CALENDAR
2018-03-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/12 CALENDAR
2018-03-09HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2018
2018-03-07HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2018-03-07HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-03-07HouseNR: REINBOLD
2018-03-07HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, LEDOUX, CLAMAN
2018-03-07HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 5DP 1NR 1AM
2018-02-09HouseFN1: ZERO(DOT)
2018-02-09HouseAM: KOPP, CLAMAN, DRUMMOND, EASTMAN, WOOL
2018-02-09HouseDP: STUTES
2018-02-09HouseTRA RPT CS(TRA) 1DP 5AM
2018-02-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-01-16HouseTRA, JUD
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-08HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/18

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback