AK HB250 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an expression of apology, sympathy, commiseration, compassion, or benevolence by a health care provider inadmissible in a medical malpractice case; requiring a health care provider to advise a patient or the patient's legal representative to seek legal advice before making an agreement with the patient to correct an unanticipated outcome of medical treatment or care; and amending Rules 402, 407, 408, 409, and 801, Alaska Rules of Evidence.
Title
Medical Malpractice Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/6/14 |
2014-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/8 CHAPTER 62 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | House | 9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-05-19 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 250(HSS) AM |
2014-04-16 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-16 | Senate | COGHILL, MICCICHE, DYSON |
2014-04-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, MEYER, STEDMAN, EGAN, BISHOP, GARDNER, MCGUIRE, |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 250(HSS) AM |
2014-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | NR: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-04-16 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON |
2014-04-16 | Senate | JUD RPT 3DP 1NR |
2014-04-11 | Senate | JUD |
2014-04-11 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-11 | House | VERSION: CSHB 250(HSS) AM |
2014-04-11 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK, KAWASAKI, LEDOUX, HERRON |
2014-04-11 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-11 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y33 E3 A4 |
2014-04-11 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-04-11 | House | OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-11 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-11 | House | PASSED Y34 E3 A3 |
2014-04-11 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2014-04-11 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-11 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 250(HSS) |
2014-04-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CALENDAR |
2014-04-10 | House | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER |
2014-03-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2014-03-27 | House | NR: LEDOUX, LYNN |
2014-03-27 | House | DP: FOSTER, GRUENBERG, KELLER |
2014-03-27 | House | JUD RPT CS(HSS) NT 3DP 2NR |
2014-03-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2014-03-17 | House | DP: REINBOLD, PRUITT, KELLER, NAGEAK, TARR, HIGGINS |
2014-03-17 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 6DP |
2014-01-21 | House | HSS, JUD |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/17/14 |