AK HB247 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - FN2: (DFG)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the fish and game fund; relating to a sport fishing surcharge; providing for an effective date by amending the effective date of sec. 21, ch. 18, SLA 2016; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sport Fishing Enhancement Surcharge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-23 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: Waive Uniform Rule 23(a) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08HouseFN2: (DFG)
2020-04-08HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 205
2020-04-08HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
2020-03-24SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2020-03-24SenateFIN
2020-03-24SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-24HouseVERSION: CSHB 247(FSH)
2020-03-24HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-03-24HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 E3 A2
2020-03-24HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N12 E3 A2
2020-03-24HouseRECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2020-03-23SenateFIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2020-03-23HousePRUITT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2020-03-23HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 N1 E3 A1
2020-03-23HousePASSED Y25 N11 E3 A1
2020-03-23HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 247(FSH)
2020-03-21HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/23 CALENDAR
2020-03-21HouseFSH CS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-21HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-21HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2020
2020-03-21HouseFN2: (DFG)
2020-03-21HouseNR: CARPENTER, TILTON, JOSEPHSON
2020-03-21HouseDP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, WOOL, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
2020-03-21HouseFIN RPT CS(FSH) NT 7DP 3NR
2020-03-19HouseFIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) (PSD) Y23 N15 E2
2020-03-19HouseMOTION TO WAIVE FIN PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) W/ HB 290
2020-03-19HouseFN1: (DFG)
2020-03-19HouseDP: VANCE, TARR, KOPP, STUTES
2020-03-19HouseFSH RPT CS(FSH) NT 4DP
2020-02-12HouseGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2020-02-12HouseFN1: (DFG)
2020-02-12HouseFSH, FIN
2020-02-12HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback