AK HB245 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF SCR 501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-11 - FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF SCR 501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska permanent fund; relating to appropriations to the dividend fund; relating to income of the Alaska permanent fund; relating to the earnings reserve account; relating to the Alaska permanent fund dividend; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Perm. Fund:deposits;dividend;earnings
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF SCR 501 |
2016-07-13 | House | FIFTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2016-05-23 | Senate | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL - WITH PASSAGE OF HCR 401 |
2016-05-23 | House | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2016-01-19 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2016-01-19 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2016-01-19 | House | FN2: ZERO(REV) |
2016-01-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(REV) |
2016-01-19 | House | FIN |
2016-01-19 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Finance
Funds
Leases
Minerals
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Revenue
Taxation
Finance
Funds
Leases
Minerals
Oil & Gas
Permanent Fund
Public Corporations
Public Finance
Revenue
Taxation
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=29&bill=HB245 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0245A.PDF |