AK HB240 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to prescription prices available to consumers; relating to penalties for certain pharmacy or pharmacist violations; relating to the registration and duties of pharmacy benefits managers; relating to procedures, guidelines, and enforcement mechanisms for pharmacy audits; relating to the cost of multi-source generic drugs and insurance reimbursement procedures; relating to the duties of the director of the division of insurance; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Pricing; Pharmacy Benefits Managers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-08HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-07SenateVERSION: CSHB 240(FIN)
2018-05-07SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-07SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-07SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-07SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, OLSON, MEYER, HUGHES, BISHOP
2018-05-07SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 240(FIN)
2018-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-07SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-07SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2018
2018-04-30SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH
2018-04-27SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN
2018-04-20SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, STEVENS, GARDNER, EGAN, KELLY
2018-04-20SenateFN4: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2018-04-20SenateNR: OLSON
2018-04-20SenateDP: MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2018-04-20SenateFIN RPT 6DP 1NR
2018-04-14SenateFIN
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-13HouseVERSION: CSHB 240(FIN)
2018-04-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, STUTES, KOPP, TUCK, TARR
2018-04-13HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-13HousePASSED Y40
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 240(FIN)
2018-04-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-13HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018
2018-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ
2018-04-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2018-04-06HouseFN3: ZERO(ADM)
2018-04-06HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-04-06HouseNR: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT
2018-04-06HouseDP: GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-06HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 3NR
2018-03-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KNOPP
2018-02-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH, KITO
2018-02-05HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2018-02-05HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2018-02-05HouseNR: STUTES, KNOPP, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON
2018-02-05HouseDNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-02-05HouseDP: WOOL, KITO
2018-02-05HouseL&C RPT 2DP 1DNP 4NR
2018-02-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-05-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-04-28HouseL&C, FIN
2017-04-28HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback