AK HB240 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to prescription prices available to consumers; relating to penalties for certain pharmacy or pharmacist violations; relating to the registration and duties of pharmacy benefits managers; relating to procedures, guidelines, and enforcement mechanisms for pharmacy audits; relating to the cost of multi-source generic drugs and insurance reimbursement procedures; relating to the duties of the director of the division of insurance; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Drug Pricing; Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-08 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-05-07 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 240(FIN) |
2018-05-07 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-07 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-07 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL, OLSON, MEYER, HUGHES, BISHOP |
2018-05-07 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 240(FIN) |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-07 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-07 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/7/2018 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2018-04-27 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STEDMAN |
2018-04-20 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, STEVENS, GARDNER, EGAN, KELLY |
2018-04-20 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2018-04-20 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-04-20 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-20 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP 1NR |
2018-04-14 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 240(FIN) |
2018-04-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, STUTES, KOPP, TUCK, TARR |
2018-04-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-13 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 240(FIN) |
2018-04-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-13 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA |
2018-04-06 | House | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-04-06 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-06 | House | NR: WILSON, TILTON, PRUITT |
2018-04-06 | House | DP: GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-06 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 3NR |
2018-03-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KNOPP |
2018-02-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, KITO |
2018-02-05 | House | FN2: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2018-02-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-02-05 | House | NR: STUTES, KNOPP, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON |
2018-02-05 | House | DNP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2018-02-05 | House | DP: WOOL, KITO |
2018-02-05 | House | L&C RPT 2DP 1DNP 4NR |
2018-02-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2017-05-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2017-04-28 | House | L&C, FIN |
2017-04-28 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |