AK HB24 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to instruction in a language other than English; and relating to limited teacher certificates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limited Teacher Certificates; Languages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2020-03-16HouseFN3: ZERO(CED)
2020-03-16HouseFN2: (EED)
2020-03-16HouseNR: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK, WOOL, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2020-03-16HouseDP: ORTIZ, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
2020-03-16HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 6DP 5NR
2020-03-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
2020-03-09HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
2020-03-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2020-03-03HouseFN2: (EED)
2020-03-03HouseDP: HANNAN, GILLIS, STORY, FIELDS, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ
2020-03-03HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 6DP
2020-03-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN
2019-07-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STORY
2019-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2019-04-05HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2019-04-05HouseNR: REVAK, HOPKINS
2019-04-05HouseDP: TUCK, ZULKOSKY, JOHNSON, STORY, DRUMMOND
2019-04-05HouseEDC RPT 5DP 2NR
2019-02-20HouseEDC, L&C
2019-02-20HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-02-20HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/7/19

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback