AK HB24 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act classifying U-47700 as a schedule IA controlled substance; classifying tramadol and related substances as schedule IVA controlled substances; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

List U-47700 As A Controlled Substance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-05HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2017-04-03SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 24(JUD)
2017-04-03SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2017-04-03SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-03SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-04-03SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 24(JUD)
2017-04-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-03SenateJUD SCS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-03SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-31SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2017
2017-03-31SenateFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-31SenateFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-03-31SenateFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2017-03-31SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2017-03-31SenateFN1: ZERO(COR)
2017-03-31SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, COSTELLO, MEYER, KELLY
2017-03-31SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 9
2017-03-31SenateJUD RPT SCS 5DP NEW TITLE
2017-03-08SenateJUD
2017-03-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-06HouseVERSION: CSHB 24(FIN)
2017-03-06HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK, BIRCH, KOPP, JOSEPHSON, PARISH, SADDLER
2017-03-06HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-03-06HousePASSED Y39 N1
2017-03-06HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 24(FIN)
2017-03-06HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-06HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-06HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2017
2017-02-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PRUITT
2017-02-24HouseFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-24HouseFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-24HouseFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2017-02-24HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2017-02-24HouseFN1: ZERO(COR)
2017-02-24HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2017-02-24HouseDP: GARA, WILSON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-02-24HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP 1AM
2017-02-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FOSTER, THOMPSON, GRENN
2017-02-03HouseFN5: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-03HouseFN4: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-03HouseFN3: ZERO(LAW)
2017-02-03HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2017-02-03HouseFN1: ZERO(COR)
2017-02-03HouseNR: EASTMAN, LEDOUX
2017-02-03HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, FANSLER, REINBOLD, CLAMAN
2017-02-03HouseJUD RPT 5DP 2NR
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
2017-01-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STUTES, REINBOLD
2017-01-18HouseJUD, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback